+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2015 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 5-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (64-Y 32-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 6-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 14101386D
+ − Votes (4)
February 21, 2014: Continued to 2015 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 5-N)
January 22, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 32-N)
January 17, 2014: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 6-N)
January 16, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor