+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 18, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0153)
On March 9, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1052ER)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 153 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
On March 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1052ER)
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 963310817-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Robinson agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Militia and Police (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented & ordered printed 963310817
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1996: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
January 30, 1996: Reported from Militia and Police (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor