+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 81 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1050ER)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 8, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (7)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1994: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1994: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor