+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 11, 2020 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1137 (effective 7/1/20)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1137)
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1049ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 20109773D-H1
- Amended by conference committee
On March 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (52-Y 40-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 40-N)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: Bell, McPike, Dunnavant
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Delegates: Levine, Roem, Wampler
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 15-N)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 20109308D-S1 (1-Y 97-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 20109308D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1049S1
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 20109308D-S1
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (59-Y 39-N)
- Read third time and passed House (59-Y 39-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Speaker ruled floor amendment by Delegate Davis not germane
- Engrossed by House
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104785D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
March 8, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N)
March 8, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 40-N)
March 5, 2020: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 15-N)
March 4, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
March 3, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N)
March 2, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N)
February 5, 2020: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 39-N)
January 28, 2020: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N)
January 28, 2020: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N)
January 23, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
January 23, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark H. Levine
Type:
Primary Sponsor