+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 87 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1048ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 14102655D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1048E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 14102655D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2014: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2014: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor