+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 91 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1047ER)
- Enrolled
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103894D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2020: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Paul E. Krizek
Type:
Primary Sponsor