+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 4, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
On March 31, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 437 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1046ER)
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 964119296
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1996: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1996: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor