+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0592)
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 592 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1044ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084644824
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 29, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2008: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor