+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 488 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1044ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107728D-S1 (62-Y 36-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 36-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107728D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1044S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107728D-S1
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (61-Y 39-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 39-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100488D
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 36-N)
March 5, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
March 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 39-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Education (15-Y 7-N)
February 2, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor