+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chair rules the bill is not properly before the Senate
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker ruled amendment by Senate not germane
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (23-Y 17-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Senator Petersen agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 5-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1043H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105603D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22105603D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104009D