+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0866)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 866 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1041ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1041ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1041H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 062745372-H1
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062745372-H1
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Insurance (Hargrove)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062656252
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor