+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 538 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1041ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Juv. Justice & Dom. Rel.
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 981911836
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor