+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 753 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 27, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1041ER)
On March 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 4-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 4-N)
- Conference substitute printed 041296496-H2
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
- Delegates: Saxman, Griffith, Watts
On March 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Obenshain, Cuccinelli, Reynolds
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on sub. w/amds. (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 94-N)
- Senate sub. w/amds. rejected by House (4-Y 94-N)
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Amendments by Sen. Obenshain agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 041016820-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds.(40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute w/amds HB1041S1
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amds.(39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 041016820-S1
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1041H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 040567496-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 040567496-H1
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 040868104