+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N)
- Read third time and passed House (54-Y 43-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB104H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106123D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22106123D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 8-N)
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103646D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 21, 2022: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (9-Y 6-N)
February 11, 2022: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N)
February 7, 2022: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 8-N)
February 4, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor