+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 521 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 27, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB104ER)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 041329260-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB104E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd (21-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/17/03 041329260
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2004: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2004: Reported from Finance with amd (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor