+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 8, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1018)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE-ENROLLED FORM (37-Y 2-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Passed in enrolled form (78-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: (78-Y 21-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed in enrolled form (37-Y 2-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Bill became law, Chapter 1018 (effective 4/19/00)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of passage in enrolled form (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed in enrolled form (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE-ENROLLED FORM (36-Y 3-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Governor's veto overridden
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1036ER)
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Emergency clause added
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 003372644-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 003372644-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 003372644-H1
- Reported from L. & C. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to L. & C. sub-committee: 1
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 003323644
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE-ENROLLED FORM (36-Y 3-N)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: (78-Y 21-N)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE-ENROLLED FORM (37-Y 2-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2000: Reported from C. & L. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2000: Reported from L. & C. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor