+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Left in Finance
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Continued to 2017 in Finance by voice vote
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 (9-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100268D