+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0146)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 146 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1034ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 14103227D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1034E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103227D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2014: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor