+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106577D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1033H1
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106577D-H1
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102791D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice