+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
On March 8, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 145 (effective 10/1/96)
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 20, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1032ER)
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 966834424-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 966834424-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 966834424-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 966819819