+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 9-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1031H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 062472340-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062472340-H1
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Courts of Justice sub-committee: Criminal Law
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 064386340
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2006: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 9-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor