+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102809D
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2016: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor