+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 315 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1028ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Local Gov sub: Charters
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101728D
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2022: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2022: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2022: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2022: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor