+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 264 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1027ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1027H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106440D-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106440D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100594D
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor