+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1023E
- Printed as engrossed 10101556D-E
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reported from Science and Technology with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned S & T sub: #1
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101556D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Reported from Science and Technology with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor