+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 10, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1126)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 1126 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1023ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 20109985D-H1
- Amended by conference committee
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: McClellan, Morrissey, McDougle
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Delegates: Adams, L.R., Watts, Carroll Foy
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
- Senate substitute with amendment rejected by House 20108202D-S1 (0-Y 100-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108202D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1023S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20108202D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 20101713D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1023E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101713D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (11)
March 8, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
February 21, 2020: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2020: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Les R. Adams
Type:
Primary Sponsor