+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0862)
- Enacted, Chapter 862 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1022ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 1-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1022ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 064405340-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1022E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Courts of Justice sub-committee: Criminal Law
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 064405340
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor