+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102397D
+ − Vote
February 8, 2018: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor