+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 662 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1020ER)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7175236 (HB1020H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed