+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB102ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On December 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100273D
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor