+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 10, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0337)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 337 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1018ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103469D
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor