+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0443)
On March 7, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 443 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1015ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
- Introduced bill reprinted 088671548
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088671548
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2008: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2008: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor