+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1014ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N)
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (89-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1014EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Plum agreed to
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 083517548-EH1
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Substitute by Delegate Cole withdrawn
- Floor substitute printed 083552468-H2 ( Cole)
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 083517548-H1
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 083517548-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: 1
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086974548