+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 431 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1014ER)
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105619D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1014S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105619D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105619D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 10102168D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1014E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102168D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 11, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor