+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #5 Mental Health
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102106D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor