+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140)
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 140 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB101ER)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (23-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/98 983756198
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1998: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from Labor and Commerce (23-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor