+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
On March 23, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1009ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1009H2
- Substitute by Delegate Hurt agreed to 063050340-H2
- Floor substitute printed 063050340-H2 (Hurt)
- Committee substitute rejected 062860204-H1
- Read second time
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062860204-H1
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Courts of Justice sub-committee: Civil Law
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 066067340
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor