+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0723)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 723 (effective 4/10/94)
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1008ER)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (94-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD4739430 (HB1008E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (94-Y 4-N)
February 11, 1994: Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor