+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0662)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 662 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1007ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102048D