+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1007ER)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1007H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 049562492-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 049562492-H1
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to C. & L. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 041334492
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor