+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 1, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1004)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (38-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (88-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (88-Y 11-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1004 (effective 7/1/96)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 10, 1996 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 19, 1996 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1007ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- General Laws & Finance committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 4-N)
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (13-Y 4-N)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (14-Y 1-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 966011484-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 966011484-H1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Read first time
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 966011484-H1
- Reconsidered by Appropriations
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Continued to 1997 in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 965932376