+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and defeated by House (49-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: DEFEATED (49-Y 49-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105707D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1001H1
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105707D-H1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104615D
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2018: VOTE: DEFEATED (49-Y 49-N)
January 23, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor