+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 9, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 815 (effective 4/8/02)
On March 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB100ER)
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 020432408-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 020432408-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 020432408-S1
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Amendment by Del. Callahan agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 024289208-E
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds (25-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Pres. & ord. printed w/emg clause pref.12/19/01 024289208
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2002: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 21, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2002: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 11, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2002: Reported from Appropriations with amds (25-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2002: Referred from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor