+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0559)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 559 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB100ER)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Edwards agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 1-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 987339176-E
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/98 987339176
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 1-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor