+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (53)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0818)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 818 (effective 7/1/10)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (64-Y 30-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (62-Y 34-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (62-Y 34-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 6-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 (64-Y 30-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (29-Y 9-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB10ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB10ER)
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (80-Y 17-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105754D-S1 (80-Y 17-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105754D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Petersen rejected (15-Y 25-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB10S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N)
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 10105754D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (72-Y 26-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 10104740D-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB10EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Marshall, R. G. agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104740D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104740D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: #2
On December 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100949D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (13)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 6-N)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (29-Y 9-N)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (64-Y 30-N)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (62-Y 34-N)
March 10, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (80-Y 17-N)
March 8, 2010: Amendment by Senator Petersen rejected (15-Y 25-N)
March 8, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N)
March 3, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
February 11, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N)
February 4, 2010: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 5-N)
January 28, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor