+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 806 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0806)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 18108228D-H3
- Passed by temporarily
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Suetterlein, Newman, Lucas
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Wilt, Peace, Bulova
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107257D-S1 (38-Y 61-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (38-Y 61-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107257D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107257D-S1
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (62-Y 35-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed 18106647D-H2 (Wilt)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected 18105888D-H1
- Substitute by Delegate Wilt agreed to 18106647D-H2
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1H2
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105888D-H1
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On November 20, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100527D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
+ − Votes (11)
March 10, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
March 10, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
February 23, 2018: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (38-Y 61-N)
February 19, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N)
February 16, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
January 30, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor