+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104953D-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104953D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On November 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100790D
+ − Votes (3)
February 19, 2014: Continued to 2015 in Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
February 11, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2014: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor