+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0869)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #3 (37-Y 3-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, #2, #4, #5 (40-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1459ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 869 (effective 7/1/11)
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1459ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 11105403D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105403D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1459H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11105403D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1459S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104889D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11104889D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed 11104125D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (13)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #3 (37-Y 3-N)
February 23, 2011: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Rereferred from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor