+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ61ER)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Taken up
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103128D
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2016: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2016: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor