+ − Actions (10)
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- As adopted by Senate and House
- House message House adopted in concurrence
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted in Concurrence
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted on the part of the Senate
- Unfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption
On May 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor